EP0936557 - Cache coherency protocol for a data processing system including a multilevel memory hierarchy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arimilli, Ravi Kumar 9221 Spicebrush Drive Austin, Texas 78759 / US | 02 /
Dodson, John Steven 1205 Bell Rock Circle Pflugerville, Texas 78660 / US | 03 /
Lewis, Jerry Don 3409 Arrowhead Circle Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1999/33] | Burrington, Alan Graham Headford Alan Burrington & Associates 41 The Street Ashtead Surrey KT21 1AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301067.7 | 15.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | US19980024318 | 17.02.1998 Original published format: US 24318 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0936557 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0936557 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936557 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
G06F12/0831 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (KR);
G06F12/0811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2000/38] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Cache-Speicherkohärenzprotokoll für ein Datenverarbeitungssystem mit mehrstufiger Speicherhierarchie | [1999/33] | English: | Cache coherency protocol for a data processing system including a multilevel memory hierarchy | [1999/33] | French: | Protocole de cohérence d'antémémoire pour un système de traitement de données comprenant une hiérarchie de mémoire à niveaux multiples | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 13.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.05.2003 | DE | 29.08.2003 | IE | 16.02.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/19] | DE | 29.08.2003 | |
IE | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/23] | DE | 29.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2178205 (ENCORE COMPUTER CORP) [Y] 8,9* abstract *; | [XY]EP0681241 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 5; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4,8,9; | [Y]US5588131 (BORRILL PAUL L [US]) [Y] 3,4 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 2 * |