EP0937887 - Control system for an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-0028 / JP | [2006/38] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fucho-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 735 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taga, Junichi 1032-1-C302, Miyaryo, Takaya-cho Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Imada, Michihiro 528-7, Umaki 8-chome, Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Kuroki, Masayuki 2-43-610, Sakurao 2-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 04 /
Tetsuno, Masayuki 30-25-302, yagi 9-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 05 /
Mamiya, Kiyotaka 18-24, Hiachihonmatsuminami 4-chome Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 06 /
Nishimura, Hirofumi 15-9, Kuchitaminami 9-chome, Asakita-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/34] | 01 /
Taga, Junichi 1032-1-C302, Miyaryo, Takaya-cho Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | ||
02 /
Imada, Michihiro Umaki 8-chome, Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | |||
03 /
Kuroki, Masayuki 2-43-610, Sakurao 2-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima / JP | |||
04 /
Tetsuno, Masayuki 30-25-302, yagi 9-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | |||
05 /
Mamiya, Kiyotaka 18-24, Hiachihonmatsuminami 4-chome Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | |||
06 /
Nishimura, Hirofumi 15-9, Kuchitaminami 9-chome, Asakita-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301254.1 | 22.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | JP19980038782 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3878298 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0937887 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0937887 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937887 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D43/00, F02D41/30, F02D35/00, F02D33/02, F02D41/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
F02D41/3064 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0015 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/34] | F02D43/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/29] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1999/34] | English: | Control system for an engine | [1999/34] | French: | Système de contrôle d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.09.2006 | IT | 20.09.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | GB | 22.02.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | IT | 20.09.2006 | |
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | IT | 20.09.2006 | |
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | IT | 20.09.2006 | |
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 31.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07279709 ; | US6012428 [ ] (YANO TORU [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 15, line 4 - line 15 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO9712127 (ORBITAL ENG PTY [AU], et al) [Y] 2,5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9636802 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 3; | US5960765 [ ] (IIDA KAZUMASA [JP], et al) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07279709 A 19951027 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5,7,9 | by applicant | JPH08312402 |