EP1033684 - Paper dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wayfarer Transit Systems Ltd Farrs House, Cowgrove Wimborne Dorset BH21 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Wayfarer Transit Systems Ltd Farrs House, Cowgrove Wimborne, Dorset BH21 4EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pickering, Philip John 20 Clifton Road, Parkstone Poole, Dorset BH14 9PP / GB | 02 /
Traves, Gerald Robert 48 Howard Road Bournemouth, Dorset BH8 9EA / GB | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301491.9 | 01.03.1999 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033684 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07B3/02, G07B5/10, B65H16/04, B65H26/08, B65H75/08 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
B65H16/005 (EP);
B65H16/04 (EP);
B65H26/08 (EP);
B65H75/08 (EP);
G07B3/02 (EP);
G07B5/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Papierspender | [2000/36] | English: | Paper dispenser | [2000/36] | French: | Distributeur de papier | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/15] | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.05.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0360400 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 3,6; | [Y]US5725321 (J. A. BRANNAN ET AL.) [Y] 3,6 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]US3860191 (DON W. GERI) [X] 1 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [X]US3997124 (Y. SATO) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]JPS6145849 ; | [A]EP0401036 (SONY CORPORATION) [A] 1,3-7 * column 13, line 45 - column 14, line 5; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPH10120309 ; | [A]US5513920 (J. WHRITENOR ET AL.); | [A]US5388923 (M. DUBOIS ET AL.) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860717), vol. 010, no. 204, Database accession no. (M - 499), & JP61045849 A 19860305 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 098, no. 010, & JP10120309 A 19980512 (TEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |