EP0945790 - Method and apparatus for implementing fast subclass and subtype checks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bak, Lars 3782 Corina Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
Mitrovic, Srdjan 826 Mediterranean Lane Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
Holzle, Urs 2298 Cornell Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1999/39] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301639.3 | 04.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | US19980079110P | 23.03.1998 Original published format: US 79110 P | US19980107224 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: US 107224 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945790 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945790 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945790 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
G06F9/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/05] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Implementieren von schnellen Subclass- und Subtyp-Überprüfungen | [1999/39] | English: | Method and apparatus for implementing fast subclass and subtype checks | [1999/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour réaliser des vérifications des sous-classes et sous-types | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 08.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - [email protected] | [Y] - DAVE HARRIS | [A] - STEENKISTE P ET AL, "TAGS AND TYPE CHECKING IN LISP: HARDWARE AND SOFTWARE APPROACHES", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW (SIGOPS), ACM HEADQUARTER. NEW YORK, US, (19871001), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 50 - 59, XP000001708 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/36204.36183 | [A] - ANDREW BRAULT |