EP0945911 - Satellite broadcast receiving converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shigetaka 75-2 Aza-fudanozawa, Haragama Soma-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Shigeru 51-1-202 Shinmachi, Watari-cho Watari-gun, Miyagi-ken / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301854.8 | 10.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980079090 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: JP 07909098 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945911 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/161 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H01P1/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Empfangsumsetzer für Satellitenrundfunk | [1999/39] | English: | Satellite broadcast receiving converter | [1999/39] | French: | Convertisseur de réception pour télédiffusion par satellite | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/39] | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5017938 (DIENES GEZA [US]) [A] 1* column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-3,5,6 *; | [A]DE4213539 (MASPRO DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5245353 (GOULD HARRY J [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 55 - line 68 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 30; figure 7 *; | [A]US5459441 (WEBER JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 22 - line 50; figures 2-5 *; | [A]DE19629277 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 9; figures 1-3 * |