EP1038962 - Peptidoglycan biosynthetic gene murF from Streptococcus pneumoniae [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | ||
For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallis, Nicola G., SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 1250 South Collegeville Road P.O. Box 5089 Collegeville, PA 19426-0989 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301987.6 | 15.03.1999 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038962 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12N9/00, C12N1/21, C07K16/40, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/527 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N9/93 (EP);
C12Q1/6876 (EP);
C12Y603/0201 (EP);
G01N33/56944 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP);
G01N2333/315 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Peptidoglycan biosynthetisches Gen MurF von Streptococcus pneumoniae | [2000/39] | English: | Peptidoglycan biosynthetic gene murF from Streptococcus pneumoniae | [2000/39] | French: | Gène biosynthétique des peptidoglycanes, murF de Streptococcus pneumoniae | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 11.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9818931 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-19 * Note: 95.4% identity of SEQ ID NO:196 in 1647 bp overlap with SEQ ID NO:1.; page 1167 - page 1168 * * page 104 * * page 1 - page 53 * [A] 3,4; | [Y]EP0816502 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * page 2 * * pages 14-19 *; | [XAY] - MASSIDDA ET AL., "Unconventional organization of the division and cell wal gene cluster of Streptococcus pneumonia", MICROBIOLOGY, (199811), vol. 144, pages 3069 - 3078, XP002110571 [X] 1,2,5-13,15,16,18,19 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 3071, column R, lines 7-9 * * figure 1 * * table 2 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 14-17 | [A] - BOUHSS ET AL., "Invariant amino acids in the Mur peptide synthetases of bacterial peptidoglycan synthesis and their modification by site-directed mutagenesis in the UDP-MurNAc:L-alanine ligase from Escherichia coli", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19970930), vol. 36, pages 11556 - 11563, XP002111608 [A] 1-12,19 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi970797f | [A] - HEIJENOORT, "Assembly of the monomer unit of bacterial peptidoglycan", CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (199804), vol. 54, pages 300 - 304, XP002110572 [A] 1-19 * page 300, column L * * page 301, column R - page 302, column L * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s000180050155 |