EP0950769 - Faucet component systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN STANDARD INC. One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 6820 Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states AMERICAN STANDARD INC. One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 6820 Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitsch, Walter 91 Sapphire Lane Franklin Park, New Jersey 08823 / US | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302009.8 | 16.03.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | US19980061789 | 16.04.1998 Original published format: US 61789 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950769 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950769 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950769 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
E03C1/04 (EP,US);
E03C2201/50 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5109 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6977 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/42] | Title | German: | Wasserhahnkomponentensysteme | [1999/42] | English: | Faucet component systems | [1999/42] | French: | Systèmes de composants pour robinets | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2004 | BE | 02.06.2004 | CH | 02.06.2004 | FI | 02.06.2004 | FR | 02.06.2004 | IT | 02.06.2004 | LI | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | DK | 02.09.2004 | GR | 02.09.2004 | SE | 02.09.2004 | DE | 03.09.2004 | ES | 13.09.2004 | PT | 02.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
FR | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
DE | 03.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
DE | 03.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
DE | 03.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
LI | 02.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5073991 (MARTY GARRY R [US]) [A] 3,9,10* column 5, line 53 - column 5, line 65; figure 5 *; | [Y]US5368071 (HSIEH YUNG-LI [TW]) [Y] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5465749 (SAUTER BRUCE M [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 18 - column 2, line 20; figures 1-7,11-15 * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 56 * |