EP1052083 - Fibre reinforced composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Representative(s) | Edis, Ronald Malcolm, et al British Aerospace plc Group IP Department Lancaster House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Edis, Ronald Malcolm, et al British Aerospace plc Group IP Department Lancaster House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302224.3 | 23.03.1999 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052083 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/52 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B29C70/525 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Faserverbundwerkstoffe | [2000/46] | English: | Fibre reinforced composites | [2000/46] | French: | Matériaux composites renforcés par des fibres | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/14] | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2001/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2081638 (LORD CORP) [A] 1,9 * figure 3; claim 13 *; | [A]EP0017010 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,9 * claim - * |