EP0982691 - Paper-leaves discriminating apparatus and sensor mounting construction of same apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Toshimasa, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302394.4 | 29.03.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | JP19980212182 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21218298 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982691 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982691 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982691 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G07D7/04 (EP,KR,US);
G07D7/20 (EP,KR,US);
G07F19/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/04] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Papierblättern und Sensormontage dafür | [2000/09] | English: | Paper-leaves discriminating apparatus and sensor mounting construction of same apparatus | [2000/09] | French: | Dispositif pour l'examen des feuilles de papier et d'un assemblage de capteur pour cela | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 10.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5420406 (IZAWA HIKARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9; | [A]WO9610800 (CUMMINS ALLISON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9; | [A]EP0762344 (NIPPON KINSEN KIKAI KK [JP])[A] 1-9 |