EP0955468 - Centrifugal flow fan and fan/orifice assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION One Carrier Place Farmington Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse, New York 13221 / US | ||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yehia M.Amr 24Rd-21 Apt 9, Maadi Cairo / EG | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2001/35] | Powell, Timothy John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1999/45] | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302532.9 | 31.03.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | US19980072109 | 04.05.1998 Original published format: US 72109 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955468 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955468 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955468 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/28, F04D29/42 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
F04D29/282 (EP,US);
F04D29/4213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/48] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zentrifugallüfter und Lüfter-/Einlassanordnung | [1999/45] | English: | Centrifugal flow fan and fan/orifice assembly | [1999/45] | French: | Ventilateur radial et assemblage ventilateur/orifice | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5249927 (VERA JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,5,7,12* the whole document *; | [A]EP0692637 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,7,12 * the whole document * |