EP0949724 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Kikuo 1757-101 Kamiwada Yamato, Kanagawa 242-0014 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Takao 2-10-29-402 Motomachi, Tsujido Fujisawa, Kanagawa 251-0047 / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 18 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302747.3 | 08.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980096373 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9637398 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949724 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949724 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/72, H01R9/09, H01R23/68 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
H01R12/714 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | H01R23/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/52] |
Former [2000/44] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder | [1999/41] | English: | Electrical connector | [1999/41] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5466161 (YUMIBE GEORGE ET AL) [A] 1-8 * column A; figure 11 *; | [A]EP0568971 (MOLEX INC) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0706240 (MOLEX INC) |