EP0952644 - Dynamic control for laser diode drivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems Optoelectronics Guardian Corporation 9333 South John Young Parkway Orlando Florida 32819-8698 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Agere Systems Optoelectronics Guardian Corporation 9333 South John Young Parkway Orlando, Florida 32819-8698 / US | ||
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ransijn, Johannes Gerardus 61 Park Road Wyomissing Hills, Pennsylvania 19609 / US | 02 /
Yoder, James Daniel 234 Riveredge Drive Leola Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17540 / US | 03 /
Salvador, Gregory C. 300 Kappa Court Wernersville, Pennsylvania 19565 / US | [1999/47] |
Former [1999/43] | 01 /
Ransijn, Johannes Gerardus 61 Park Road Wyomissing Hills, Pennsylvania 19609 / US | ||
02 /
Yoder, James Daniel 515 E. Roseville Road Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17601 / US | |||
03 /
Salvador, Gregory C. 300 Kappa Court Wernersville, Pennsylvania 19565 / US | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [1999/43] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302857.0 | 13.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | US19980064121 | 21.04.1998 Original published format: US 64121 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0952644 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0952644 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/096, H01S3/103, H01S5/042, H04B10/145, H04B10/155 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
H01S5/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/43] | H01S3/096, H01S3/103 | Designated contracting states | GB [2002/42] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dynamische Kontrolle von Steuerungsgeräte für Diodenlaser | [1999/43] | English: | Dynamic control for laser diode drivers | [1999/43] | French: | Contrôle dynamique pour les alimentations pour les lasers à diodes | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 31.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE, FR | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3848195 (KIKO F) [X] 1,3 * column 7, line 12 - column 8, line 60; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2; | [XA]US5297157 (KAISER NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2; | [XA]US5398008 (NISSLER DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2; | [A]US5383208 (QUENIAT JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 13 *; | [A]US5708673 (IKEUCHI TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure 5 * |