EP0978481 - Water purifier and method of water purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Biox Corporation 1-8 Higashikoiwa 3-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Eizo, Tokyo Biox Corporation 1-8 Higashikoiwa 3-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ito, Naoki, Tokyo Biox Corporation 1-8 Higashikoiwa 3-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Wise, Stephen James, et al c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302992.5 | 19.04.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | JP19980234983 | 06.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23498398 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0978481 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0978481 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978481 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/34 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C02F3/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/12] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserreiniger und Verfahren zur Wasserreinigung | [2000/06] | English: | Water purifier and method of water purification | [2000/06] | French: | Epurateur d eau et procédé d épuration de l eau | [2000/06] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 11.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.07.2001 | 08.06.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.07.2001 | 08.06.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2004 | BE | 17.03.2004 | CH | 17.03.2004 | ES | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | LI | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | IE | 19.04.2004 | LU | 19.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | [2016/08] |
Former [2008/17] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.04.2004 | ||
LU | 19.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
PT | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.04.2004 | ||
LU | 19.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.04.2004 | ||
LU | 19.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.04.2004 | ||
LU | 19.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LU | 19.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2535296 (REVERSO RICCARDO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0372520 (OBERKOFLER JOERG [AT]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5242593 (OBERKOFLER JOERG [AT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5716523 (POWLEN OWEN J [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A] - FAID M ET AL, "Biotechnological process for the valorization of fish waste", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. EIX95172601992, XP002146951 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - BIORESOURC TECHNOL;BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY 1994 ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, OXFORD, ENGL, (1994), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 237 - 241 |