EP0952708 - Token passing network system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Hiroshi c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Nagatani, Yuji c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwamoto, Kazuya c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303049.3 | 20.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | JP19980109519 | 20.04.1998 Original published format: JP 10951998 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0952708 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0952708 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/417 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
H04L12/417 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/37] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerksystem mit Tokenübergabe | [1999/43] | English: | Token passing network system | [1999/43] | French: | Système de réseau à passage de jeton | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 06.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 16.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/24] | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4866706 (CHRISTOPHERSEN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 18 *; | [A]EP0470056 (MARELLI AUTRONICA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 46 * * figure 1 * |