EP0956856 - BETA-GLUCOOLIGOSACCHARIDE FOR ACCELERATING CALCIUM ASSIMILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/46] | Calcium assimilation accelerator, calcium supplementing diet and method for accelerating calcium assimilation | ||
[2006/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, ES, IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Shokuhin Kako Co., Ltd. 33-8, Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [2006/47] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Nihon Shokuhin Kako Co., Ltd. 33-8, Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takase, Sachiko 903, Tokan-mansion, 3-3 Magarikane 3-chome Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Goda, Toshinao 21-11, Kawahara-cho Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Unno, Takehiro 703-25, Nakamaru Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Nakakuki, Teruo 7, Kamogreenhill, 57, Kamo Mishima-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Skailes, Humphrey John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303116.0 | 22.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | JP19980113958 | 23.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11395898 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0956856 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0956856 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956856 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/702, A61P3/14 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | A61K31/702, A61K33/06, A23L1/236, A61P3/02 | ||
Former IPC [1999/46] | A61K31/70, A61K33/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2003/04] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BETA-GLUCOOLIGOSACCHARIDE ZUR BESCHLEUNIGUNG VON CALCIUMAUFNAHME | [2006/01] | English: | BETA-GLUCOOLIGOSACCHARIDE FOR ACCELERATING CALCIUM ASSIMILATION | [2006/01] | French: | BETA-GLUCOOLIGOSACCHARIDE POUR ACCELERER L'ASSIMILATION DU CALCIUM | [2006/01] |
Former [1999/46] | Beschleuniger von Calciumaufnahme, Kalziumnahrungszusatz und Verfahren zur Beschleunigung von Calciumaufnahme | ||
Former [1999/46] | Calcium assimilation accelerator, calcium supplementing diet and method for accelerating calcium assimilation | ||
Former [1999/46] | Accelerateur d'assimilation de calcium, complément alimentaire à base de calcium et procede pour accélerer l' assimilation de calcium | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC | 05.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/30] | BE | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0415720 (JAPAN MAIZE PROD [JP]) [XD] 1-6 * page 19; example 4 *; | [X]JPS63116668 ; | [X]JPH04134031 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880929), vol. 012, no. 365, Database accession no. (C - 532), & JP63116668 A 19880520 (DAIKIN IND LTD;OTHERS: 02) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920827), vol. 016, no. 406, Database accession no. (C - 0978), & JP04134031 A 19920507 (NITSUSHIN SEITOU KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |