EP0953603 - Flame retardant semiconductor encapsulating epoxy resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asano, Eiichi, c/o Silicone-Electr. Mat.Res.Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Tomiyoshi, Kazutoshi, Silic.Electr.Mat.Res.Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoshino, Masachika, c/o Silic.Electr.Mat.Res.Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Shiobara, Toshio, c/o Silic.Electr.Mat.Res.Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 05 /
Osada, Shoichi, c/o Silic.Electr.Mat.Res.Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303240.8 | 27.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | JP19980132715 | 27.04.1998 Original published format: JP 13271598 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953603 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953603 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953603 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08K9/12, C08K3/24, H01L23/29, // (C08L63/00, 61:04) | [1999/44] | CPC: |
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/3218 (EP,US);
C08K9/12 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12528 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/12, C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L63/00, C08L61/04 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/03] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flammhemmende Epoxidharzmischung zur Halbleitereinkapselung | [1999/44] | English: | Flame retardant semiconductor encapsulating epoxy resin compositions | [1999/44] | French: | Composition de résine époxy ignifugée pour encapsuler des dispositifs semi-conducteurs | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 28.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXY]WO9901507 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3,5-7 [PY] 4; | EP0926196 [ ] (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP]) [ ] * example 8; claims 1-3,6 * * page 6, line 11 - line 43 *; | JPS59204633 [ ] (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | JPH1121432 [ ] (NIPPON SHIYAAUIN UIRIAMUZU KK); | JPH1112436 [ ] (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPS6080259 ; | JPS59182546 [ ] (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO); | [A]US3726694 (MOORE F, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 12 * | [Y] - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 102:150582/DN, HCAPLUS, URL: STN, XP002161057 [Y] 4 * abstract * | [PY] - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 130:126116/DN, HCAPLUS, URL: STN, XP002161058 [PY] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * | [PY] - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 130:96386/DN, HCAPLUS, URL: STN, XP002161059 [PY] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 25, Database accession no. 1985-148812, XP002161061 & JPS6080259 A 19850508 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 102:79810/DN, HCAPLUS, URL: STN, XP002161060 [A] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * | [A] - MARKEZICH, R.L. ET AL., ANNU. TECH. CONF. -SOC. PLAST. ENG., (1995), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 3541 - 3543, XP000986646 [A] 1 * the whole document * |