EP0959176 - Hollow sphere organic pigment for paper or paper coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blankenship, Robert Mitchell 914 St. Claire Lane Harleysville, Pennsylvania 19438 / US | 02 /
Finch, William Christopher 82 Ramsgate Court Blue Bell, Pennsylvania 19422 / US | 03 /
Mlynar, Lubomir 582 Village Circle Blue Bell, Pennsylvania 19422 / US | 04 /
Schultz, Barbara Jean 3728 Kings Road Pennsburg, Pennsylvania 18073 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2012/36] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., European Patent Department, 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303542.7 | 06.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | US19980085847 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 85847 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959176 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959176 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/34 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
D21H19/42 (EP,US);
C09B67/0004 (KR);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C08F285/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/00 (EP,US);
C09B67/006 (KR);
C09D151/003 (EP,US);
D21H21/26 (KR);
D21H21/54 (EP,KR,US);
D21H21/18 (EP,US);
D21H21/285 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | D21H19/42, C08F2/22, C08F265/02, C09D151/00, D21H21/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pigmentäre organische Hohlkugelteilchen für Papier oder Papierbeschichtungen | [1999/47] | English: | Hollow sphere organic pigment for paper or paper coatings | [1999/47] | French: | Particules sphériques pigmentaires organiques pour papier ou pour le couchage du papier | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.09.2012 | [2013/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0022633 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,5,34 * * page 59, line 21 - line 35 * * page 6, line 17 - line 23 * * page 17, line 23 - page 18, line 30 *; | [D]US4427836 (KOWALSKI ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [A]EP0188325 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 10 - line 31 * * page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 9 *; | [DA]US4806207 (MONZON MEDARDO [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * claims 1,8,10 * * column 2, line 6 - line 27 *; | [D]US4880842 (KOWALSKI ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [A]EP0342944 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 62 * * page 5, line 32 - line 47 *; | [A]EP0364629 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0376684 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0404184 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 4, line 55 - line 56; claim -; table - *; | [A]EP0441559 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-7 * claim -; table - *; | [DA]US5157084 (LEE DO I [US], et al) [DA] 1-7 * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 35 *; | [A]EP0565244 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9404603 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 12 - page 12, line 14 *; | [A]WO9511265 (LUCKY LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1* page 8, line 22 - line 29; claim - * |