EP0957417 - Work form-measuring method and device, and coordinate-measuring machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara 639-1160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku, Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | |||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku, Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoda, Yukiji, Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1 Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 02 /
Matsumiya, Sadayuki, Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1 Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
Kobi, Akihiro, Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303581.5 | 07.05.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | JP19980127278 | 11.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12727898 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0957417 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0957417 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957417 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/401 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
G05B19/401 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5196 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/29] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Werkstückformmessungsverfahren und -vorrichtung, und Koördinatenmessmaschine | [1999/46] | English: | Work form-measuring method and device, and coordinate-measuring machine | [1999/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la forme d'un objet et machine de mesure de coordonnées | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2005
14.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Henckell, Carsten Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2005
14.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Henckell, Carsten Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | 22.08.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 23.09.2011 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | GB | 07.05.2005 | DE | 01.12.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/35] | FR | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 07.05.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FR | 13.10.2004 | |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 14.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4473883 (YOSHIDA TETSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,12 * column 23, line 9 - column 26, line 60; figure 14 *; | [A]EP0665481 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3839800 (BEDERMAN S, et al) [A] 1,5,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5112131 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]) [A] 1,5,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0496968 (ROSENTHAL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,12 * the whole document * | Examination | DE3417741 | GB2108715 |