EP1000739 - Color control system and method for a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUAD/TECH, INC. N64 W23110 Main Street Sussex, WI 53089 / US | [2000/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lachajewski, Steven J. W268 N2710 Platt Street Pewaukee, Wisconsin 53072 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303584.9 | 07.05.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | US19980189655 | 10.11.1998 Original published format: US 189655 | US19990256596 | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 256596 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000739 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1000739 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B41F33/0045 (EP,US);
B41P2233/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2003/05] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbkontrollsystem und Verfahren für eine Druckmaschine | [2000/20] | English: | Color control system and method for a printing press | [2000/20] | French: | Système et procédé de contrôle de couleur pour une presse à imprimer | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5791249 (QUADRACCI THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1,12 * column W *; | [A]EP0598490 (QUAD TECH [US]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document * |