EP0956881 - Handy oxygen generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vigo Co, Ltd 5-14-1 Ginza Chuou-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2005/04] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Hoshiko Inc 11-4, Higashi-ueno 2-chome, Taito-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Shinji 2-39-201, Shimizuhomachi Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto-ken / JP | [2004/49] |
Former [1999/46] | 01 /
Ueno, Shinji 2-39-201, Shimizuhomachi Kumatomo-shi, Kumatomo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303702.7 | 12.05.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | JP19980150702 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: JP 15070298 | JP19980331935 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33193598 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0956881 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0956881 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956881 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A62B21/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A62B21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Handlicher Sauerstofferzeuger | [1999/46] | English: | Handy oxygen generator | [1999/46] | French: | Générateur d'oxygène maniable | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPS6177604 ; | [Y]JPS6222663 ; | [A]JPS6283303 ; | [A]US3615252 (DIPIETRO ANITA J) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 61 ** figure 1 *; | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860822), vol. 010, no. 245, Database accession no. (C - 368), & JP61077604 A 19860421 (NIKKA MICRON KK) [X] 11-14 * abstract * [A] 10 [Y] 1-9 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 10, Database accession no. 1987-069052, XP002128170 & JPS6222663 A 19870130 (MITSUWA SHASHIN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870918), vol. 011, no. 290, Database accession no. (C - 447), & JP62083303 A 19870416 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS647236U | JPS6417620 | JPH0440650 |