EP0958878 - Dust collector for a power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaye, Jr., Thomas R. 363 Catherine Street Bel Air, Maryland 21014 / US | 02 /
Ayala, Adan 9869 Sherwood Farm Road Owings Mill, Maryland 21117 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303753.0 | 14.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | US19980086127P | 20.05.1998 Original published format: US 86127 P | US19990257611 | 25.02.1999 Original published format: US 257611 | [2005/35] |
Former [1999/47] | US19980086127P | 20.05.1998 | |
US19990257611 | 23.02.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0958878 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0958878 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958878 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23D59/00, B23Q11/00 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B23Q11/0046 (EP,US);
B23D59/006 (EP,US);
Y10T83/207 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7697 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7772 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7788 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/33] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Staubsammler für ein Kraftwerkzeug | [1999/47] | English: | Dust collector for a power tool | [1999/47] | French: | Collecteur de poussière pour un outil motorisé | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5445056 (FOLCI GIOVANNI A [IT]) [X] 1,8-15 * column W * [A] 2-7; | [A]US3401724 (KREITZ LLOYD D) [A] 2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4489909 (TERPSTRA DANIEL A [MN], et al) [A] 5 * figure 1 * |