EP0991228 - A method, a data processing device, a system and a storage medium enabling direct communication between an image reading device and an image output device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/14] | Network user interface with profile depandable function display | ||
[2006/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Hideaki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takayama, Makoto Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kajita, Koji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Negishi, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Muto, Shin Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Tsuchitoi, Naoki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Yamamoto, Masahito Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304186.2 | 28.05.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | JP19980175313 | 09.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17531398 | JP19980216126 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21612698 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991228 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991228 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (US);
G06F3/1232 (EP,US);
G06F3/126 (EP,US);
G06F3/1291 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/50] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren, Datenverarbeitungsgerät, System und Speichereinheit zum Ermöglichen einer direkten Kommunikation zwischen einem Bildlesegerät und einem Bildausgabegerät | [2006/19] | English: | A method, a data processing device, a system and a storage medium enabling direct communication between an image reading device and an image output device | [2006/19] | French: | Procédé, dispositif de traitement de données, système et support d'enregistrement pour permettre une communication directe entre un dispositif de lecture d'images et un dispositif de sortie d'images | [2006/19] |
Former [2000/14] | Netzwerkbenutzerschnittstelle mit profilabhängiger Funktionsanzeige | ||
Former [2000/14] | Network user interface with profile depandable function display | ||
Former [2000/14] | Interface d'utilisateur dans un réseau avec une visualisation des fonction dependant d'un profil | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2006 | 20.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0602786 (CANON INFORMATION SYST INC [US]) [Y] 17,18 * abstract * * page 3, line 33 - line 58 * * page 5, line 48 - page 6, line 52 * * page 25, line 35 - page 26, line 37 * [A] 4-6,9,11,14; | JPH07287679 [ ] (CANON KK); | [Y]EP0812091 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,10-13,15,16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9800788 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,4-9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 5 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 5 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9817032 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 20 - line 37 * * page 8, line 8 - page 12, line 30 ** figures 2-7 *; | [Y]US5768516 (SUGISHIMA KIYOHISA [JP]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,10-13,15-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - line 65 * * figures 2,5 * |