EP0962481 - Sheet and tube siloxane polymers containing a pendent organofunctional group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | For all designated states CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY 11000 Cedar Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
For all designated states Case Western Reserve University 11000 Cedar Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Chenggang 12024 Mayfield Road Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | 02 /
Katsoulis, Dimitris Elias 2201 Wilmington Drive Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | 03 /
Kenney, Malcolm Edward 1203 Hereford Road Cleveland Heights, Ohio 44118 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304242.3 | 01.06.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | US19980089701 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: US 89701 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962481 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962481 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/38 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C08G77/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/25] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Organische Seitengruppe enthaltende schicht- und rohrförmige Siloxanpolymere | [1999/49] | English: | Sheet and tube siloxane polymers containing a pendent organofunctional group | [1999/49] | French: | Polymères siloxanes contenant un groupe organique pendant | [2004/18] |
Former [1999/49] | Polymères siloxane contenant une groupe organique pendante | Examination procedure | 13.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 08.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5627241 (CHEN CHENGGANG [US], et al) [DY] 1-7 * claims 1-5 * * column 2, line 10 - line 23 *; | [DY]US5605982 (CHAO TIMOTHY C [US], et al) [DY] 1-7 * claims 1-4 * * column 1, line 36 - line 46 *; | [Y]EP0379277 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * example 3 *; | [DY] - POLYMER PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (1991), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 0032-3934, pages 508 - 509, XP002143437 [DY] 1-7 * page 509, right-hand column, paragraph "Potential of Alkoxides" * |