EP0982392 - Thermally conductive grease composition and semiconductor device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Takayuki, Silicone Elec.Mat.Res. Center Shin-Etsu Chem., Co., Ltd., 7-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuidacho, Usui-Gun, Gunma-Ken / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Kunihiro, Silicone Elec.Mat.Res. Center Shin-Etsu Chem., Co., Ltd., 7-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuidacho, Usui-Gun, Gunma-Ken / JP | 03 /
Isobe, Kenichi, Silicone Elec.Mat.Res. Center Shin-Etsu Chem., Co., Ltd., 7-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuidacho, Usui-Gun, Gunma-Ken / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304369.4 | 04.06.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | JP19980235731 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23573198 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982392 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982392 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/00, C08K3/00, H01L23/373, // (C10M169/00, 101:02, 107:50, 113:06, 125:04), C10N20:06, C10N40:06, C10N50:10 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H01L23/3737 (EP,US);
C10M101/02 (EP,US);
C10M107/50 (EP,US);
C10M113/06 (EP,US);
C10M125/04 (EP,US);
C10M169/00 (EP,US);
C10M2201/05 (EP,US);
C10M2201/056 (EP,US);
C10M2203/06 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1045 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1065 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1085 (EP,US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2205/028 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2209/105 (EP,US);
C10M2211/042 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/00 (EP,US);
C10M2213/04 (EP,US);
C10M2213/06 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2229/025 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0405 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0415 (EP,US);
C10M2229/042 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0425 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0435 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0445 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0455 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0465 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0475 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0485 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0505 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0515 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0525 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0535 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0545 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
C10N2040/44 (EP,US);
C10N2040/50 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/45] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmeleitende Schmiermittelzusammensetzung und damit ausgerüstete Halbleitervorrichtung | [2000/09] | English: | Thermally conductive grease composition and semiconductor device using the same | [2000/09] | French: | Composition de graisse conductrice de chaleur et dispositif semiconducteur l'utilisant | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0696630 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 18 - line 47 * * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 43 *; | [A]GB1441433 (IND INSTR LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 32 - line 44 * * page 1, line 80 - line 89 *; | [E]EP0939115 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * |