EP1059274 - Silicon-doped boron nitride coated fibers in silicon melt infiltrated composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corman, Gregory Scott 16 Edwin Drive Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | 02 /
Luthra, Krishan Lal 780 Red Oak Drive Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304405.6 | 07.06.1999 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059274 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059274 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B35/573 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B32B18/00 (EP);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/62847 (EP);
C04B35/62849 (EP);
C04B35/62852 (EP);
C04B35/62855 (EP);
C04B35/62857 (EP);
C04B35/6286 (EP);
C04B35/62863 (EP);
C04B35/62865 (EP);
C04B35/62868 (EP,US);
C04B35/62871 (EP);
C04B35/62873 (EP);
C04B35/62894 (EP);
C04B35/62897 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP);
C04B2235/421 (EP);
C04B2235/425 (EP);
C04B2235/428 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP);
C04B2235/5248 (EP);
C04B2235/5268 (EP);
C04B2235/5276 (EP);
C04B2235/5292 (EP);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/6581 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP);
C04B2235/9684 (EP);
C04B2237/341 (EP);
C04B2237/345 (EP);
C04B2237/346 (EP);
C04B2237/348 (EP);
C04B2237/361 (EP);
C04B2237/363 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mit Silicium dotiertem Bornitrid beschichtete Fiber für Verbundwerkstoffe, die mit geschmolzenen Silicium infiltriert sind | [2000/50] | English: | Silicon-doped boron nitride coated fibers in silicon melt infiltrated composites | [2000/50] | French: | Fibres revêtues de nitrure de bore dopé au silicium dans des composites infiltrés par du silicium fondue | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Request for further processing for: | 22.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5593728 (MOORE ARTHUR W [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 35 * * column 3, line 56 - line 64 * * column 8, line 14 - line 36 *; | [Y]EP0798281 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 32 * * page 5, line 26 - line 46 * * page 6, line 2 - line 10 * * examples 1-4 *; | [Y]US5643514 (CHWASTIAK STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 13 * * examples 1,2 * |