EP0964542 - Wireless system for broadcasting, receiving and selectively printing packets of information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCH Marketing Services, Inc. 2910 Jamacha Road El Cajon, CA 92019 / US | [2009/22] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states NuWorld Marketing Ltd. 2910 Jamacha Road El Cajon, California 92019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kulakowski Robert T 1483 Neptune Avenue Leucadia California 92024 / US | 02 /
Marshall.Dr.Robert 5389 Montoya Drive El paso Texas 79932 / US | 03 /
Rogers George 3361 Crest drive Long Beach California 90807 / US | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304570.7 | 11.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | US19980096444 | 11.06.1998 Original published format: US 96444 | US19980095820 | 11.06.1998 Original published format: US 95820 | US19980096443 | 11.06.1998 Original published format: US 96443 | US19990237533 | 27.01.1999 Original published format: US 237533 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964542 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964542 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04H9/00 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04H20/72 (EP);
H04H2201/70 (EP);
H04H60/63 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2004/18] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Funkübertragung, für den Empfang und fürs wahlweise Ausdrucken von Informationspaketen | [1999/50] | English: | Wireless system for broadcasting, receiving and selectively printing packets of information | [1999/50] | French: | Système de diffusion par voie hertzienne, système de réception et système pour imprimer de façon sélective des paquets d'information | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 27.12.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.01.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | 29.01.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0783229 (U S NARROW NETWORKS INC) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 42; claim 1 * [A] 9,16,22,31,36; | [XA]US5500681 (JONES CHARLES P) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 10; claim 1 * [A] 9,16,22,31,36; | [A]US5057915 (VON KOHORN HENRY) [A] 1,9,16,22,31,36 * column 6, line 25 - line 46; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5759101 (VON KOHORN HENRY) [A] 1,9,16,22,31,36 * column 6, line 37 - column 9, line 17; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9735441 (WALDEN MICHAEL W) [A] 31 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 23; claim 1 *; | [A]US5070404 (BULLOCK WAYNE J ET AL) [A] 1,9,16,22,31,36 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 9; claims 1,2 * |