EP0965988 - Write protection method for an optical disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/51] | Recording medium for storing write protection information and write protection method thereof | ||
[2005/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Jung-wan 684-6, Seo-ri, Yidong-myun Yongin-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Kyung-geun 122-502 Shibeom Hanshin Apt., 87 Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu, Sungnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304620.0 | 14.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | KR19980022390 | 15.06.1998 Original published format: KR 9822390 | KR19980023917 | 24.06.1998 Original published format: KR 9823917 | KR19980039727 | 24.09.1998 Original published format: KR 9839727 | KR19980054190 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: KR 9854190 | KR19990004679 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: KR 9904679 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965988 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965988 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965988 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B20/12, G11B23/28 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
G11B19/122 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00094 (EP,US);
G11B20/00304 (EP,US);
G11B20/00311 (EP,US);
G11B20/00376 (EP,US);
G11B20/00702 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B23/0302 (EP,US);
G11B23/288 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B2020/1229 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1278 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1285 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/215 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/44] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schreibschutzverfahren für eine optische Platte | [2005/11] | English: | Write protection method for an optical disc | [2005/11] | French: | Procédé de protection d'écriture pour un disque optique | [2005/11] |
Former [1999/51] | Aufzeichnungsmedium zur Speicherung von Schreibschutzinformationen und Schreibschutzverfahren dazu | ||
Former [1999/51] | Recording medium for storing write protection information and write protection method thereof | ||
Former [1999/51] | Support d'enregistrement pour l'enregistrement d'information de protection d'écriture et son procédé de protection d'écriture | Examination procedure | 06.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03002191.9 / EP1315163 | EP03002192.7 / EP1308950 | EP03002193.5 / EP1308951 | EP03002194.3 / EP1306840 | EP03002195.0 / EP1306841 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5617393 (ITAMI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,20 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 10 * * column 5, line 64 - column 7, line 54 * * figures 3,5-7 * [A] 5-8,21-23; | [A]EP0406021 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,4-10,20,23 * abstract * * page 6, line 6 - line 14 * * page 6, line 46 - line 48 * * page 19, line 35 - page 21, line 5 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO9628820 (IOMEGA CORP [US]) [A] 1,4-8,20-31 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 5, line 13 * * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 4 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 9 * * page 17, line 17 - page 22, line 3 * * figures 4,6 *; | [A]US5654950 (ITOH MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 4-6 * * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 12 * * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 14 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4805061 (CHAMPAGNE PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 22 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 59 *; | [A]JPH08315361 ; | [AP]JPH1145545 ; | [AP]EP0921526 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1,2,11,16,20,32,33 * abstract * * page 7, line 49 - page 8, line 24 * * figure 5; claims 1,27 *; | [A]JPH09231018 | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Method for Write-Protecting a Program Disk", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (198803), vol. 30, no. 10, page 62, XP000073358 [A] 1,4,5,20 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08315361 A 19961129 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,4,20,31 * abstract * | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11045545 A 19990216 (SONY CORP) [AP] 1,2,11,20,32 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09231018 A 19970905 (SONY CORP) [A] * abstract * |