EP0966051 - A spacecraft battery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPACE SYSTEMS / LORAL INC. 3825 Fabian Way, M/S A-9 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states SPACE SYSTEMS / LORAL INC. 3825 Fabian Way, M/S A-9 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gelon, Walter S. 622 Island Place Redwood City, California 94065 / US | 02 /
Hall, John C. 5738 Sunmist Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90275 / US | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/51] | 01 /
Gelon, Walter S. 622 Island Place Redwood City, California 94065 / US | ||
02 /
Hall, John C. 18334 Montpere Way Saratoga, California 95070 / US | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | Finnie, Peter John Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304639.0 | 15.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | US19980097556 | 15.06.1998 Original published format: US 97556 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966051 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0966051 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/50, B64G1/50 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B64G1/425 (EP,US);
B64G1/503 (EP,US);
B64G1/506 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/617 (EP,US);
H01M10/627 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,US);
H01M10/6552 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M50/291 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Batteriesystem für Raumfahrzeuge | [1999/51] | English: | A spacecraft battery system | [1999/51] | French: | Système de batteries pour véhicules spatiaux | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5310141 (HOMER PETER K [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 9A-9F ** claim - *; | [A]EP0704919 (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 24 - line 37 *; | [X]US5634612 (FAISANT PIERRE-PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-7 * figure - * * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 11 * |