EP0965940 - Electronic banking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmott, Stephen.J 103 Millennium Tower Hopton Street London SE1 9JL / GB | 02 /
Jonhson, Graham I. 53 Castle Street Tayport, Fife DD6 9AA / GB | 03 /
Woods, Sarah Grosvenor Dock Gatliff Road London SW1W 8QR / GB | [2000/08] |
Former [2000/05] | 01 /
Emmott, Stephen.J 103 Millennium Tower Hopton Street London SE1 9JL / GB | ||
02 /
Jonhson, Graham I. 53 Castle Street Tayport, Fife DD6 9AA / GB | |||
03 /
Woods, Sarah Klipperke, Grosvenor Dock, 65 Hopton Street London SE1 9JL / GB | |||
Former [1999/51] | 01 /
Emmott, Stephen J. 103 Millennium Tower Gatliff Road, London SW1W 8QR / GB | ||
02 /
Jonhson, Graham I. 53 Castle Street Tayport, Fife DD6 9AA / GB | |||
03 /
Woods, Sarah Klipperke, Grosvenor Dock, 65 Hopton Street London SE1 9JL / GB | Representative(s) | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [1999/51] | Application number, filing date | 99304855.2 | 21.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | GB19980013155 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: GB 9813155 | GB19980019935 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9819935 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965940 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965940 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G07F7/10, G07F7/00 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/26 (EP,US);
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06Q20/327 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q20/381 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
G07F7/0873 (EP,US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/51] | G06K7/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/19] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronische Bankvorrichtung | [1999/51] | English: | Electronic banking device | [1999/51] | French: | Dispositif électronique bancaire | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5221838 (GUTMAN JOSE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,14 * column 3, line 46 - line 68 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 54 * * column 7, line 13 - line 53 * * column 8, line 19 - line 64 * * column 12, line 64 - column 13, line 50 * * column 17, line 7 - line 38 * * claims 16,36 * * figures 2A,2B *; | [A]WO9632700 (AU SYSTEM [SE], et al) [A] 1-3,6-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 26 * * page 7, line 28 - page 9, line 5 * * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 7 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 34 ** claims 1,4 *; | [A]WO9741499 (MARTINEZ JERRY R [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 2 * * page 18, line 30 - page 19, line 15 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0825546 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 10 - line 43 * * column 2, line 5 - line 31 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 9 * * column 10, line 12 - line 58 * * figures 11,12 *; | [A]EP0831412 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-10,14 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 13 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 6 - column 8, line 15 * * column 8, line 7 - line 15 * * column 9, line 26 - line 44 * * figures 2,4,6 *; | [A]WO9812674 (WAVE HOLDINGS LTD [BS], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 23, line 446 - page 25, line 499 *; | [X]US5748737 (DAGGAR ROBERT N [US]) [X] 1,2,6-10,14 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 23 * * column 7, line 34 - line 41 * * column 8, line 21 - line 60 * * column 10, line 38 - line 64 * * column 11, line 22 - column 12, line 58 * * column 13, line 13 - line 26 * * column 18, line 62 - column 19, line 15 * * column 20, line 10 - line 18 * * claims 1,4-7,10 * * figures 1,2A * |