EP0967110 - Reclining mechanism for vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asano, Makato, c/o ARACO K.K. 25 Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304880.0 | 22.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19980175068 | 22.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17506898 | JP19990081926 | 25.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8192699 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967110 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967110 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967110 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/22 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
B60N2/236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/03] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Neigungsverstellmechanismus für Fahrzeugsitze | [1999/52] | English: | Reclining mechanism for vehicle seat | [1999/52] | French: | Mécanisme d'inclinaison pour sièges de véhicules | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 05.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1193971 (WILMOT BREEDEN LTD) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0773132 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO [JP]); | [A]EP0773133 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO [JP]); | [PXA]EP0913293 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) [PX] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [AD]US5632525 (URAMICHI HIDEKI [JP]) | by applicant | JPH0852040 |