EP0967791 - Image processing method, apparatus and memory medium therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazoe, Manabu c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yano, Kentaro c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/52] |
Former [1999/52] | 01 /
Yamazoe, Manabu c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Yano, Kentaro c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [1999/52] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304889.1 | 22.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19980177272 | 24.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17727298 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967791 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967791 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967791 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G06T5/92 (EP,US);
H04N1/6077 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/52] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und -vorrichtung und Speichermedium | [1999/52] | English: | Image processing method, apparatus and memory medium therefor | [1999/52] | French: | Procédé et appareil de traitement d'image et support d'enregistrement | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10182561.0 / EP2285090 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Request for further processing for: | 03.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2011 | BE | 28.12.2011 | CY | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | IE | 22.06.2012 | LU | 22.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SE | 28.12.2011 | |
GR | 29.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0372390 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 8 *; | [A]US5057931 (NUMAKURA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* column A *; | [A]DE4309879 (HELL AG LINOTYPE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [A]US5717783 (ENDO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 64 * * column 3, line 33 - line 48 * * column 14, line 27 - line 45 * | Examination | JPH03219777 | DE4309879 | JPH06141183 | EP0665682 | JPH10178557 | US5937089 |