EP0968846 - Pneumatic tyre, producing method thereof and tyre vulcanising mould used for producing method of pneumatic tyres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Masayuki 101 Shouwamachi 187-2 Shirakawa-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kazuya 70-13 Aza-Maebayashi, Oaza-Sekibe Shirakawa-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 03 /
Omokawa, Toshihiko, 322-1 Aza-Nakamachi Oaza-Kasaishi, Kagamiishimichi Iwase-Gun, Fukushima-ken / JP | 04 /
Hanya, Masahiro 3-24 Nishimaiko 6-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305000.4 | 25.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | JP19980182301 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18230198 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968846 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0968846 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968846 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0968846 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C3/04, B29D30/20 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
B60C3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | B60C3/00, B29C35/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/04] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Luftreifen, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Vulkanisierform für ein Luftreifen Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/01] | English: | Pneumatic tyre, producing method thereof and tyre vulcanising mould used for producing method of pneumatic tyres | [2000/01] | French: | Pneumatique, son procédé de fabrication et moule de vulcanisation pour un procédé de fabrication de pneumatiques | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07228104 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO. LTD.) [X] 1-4; | [A]US4513802 (TOGASHI ET AL.) [A] 1-4 |