EP0971218 - Intergrated optical measurement instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanometrics Incorporated 310 Deguigne Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94086-3906 / US | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmes, Duane C. 12102 Plumas Drive Saratonga, CA 95070 / US | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/02] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305472.5 | 09.07.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | US19980113610 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: US 113610 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971218 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971218 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/453, G01J3/42 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
G02B21/248 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0235 (EP,US);
G01J3/0291 (EP,US);
G01J3/4535 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | G01J3/453 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/31] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierte optische Messinstrumente | [2000/02] | English: | Intergrated optical measurement instruments | [2000/02] | French: | Instruments de mesure optique intégrés | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2195467 (AIRE SCIENT LIMITED); | [A]US4810093 (DOYLE WALTER M [US]); | [XAY]EP0511448 (IBM [US]); | [Y]US5420681 (WOODRUFF ROBERT A [US]); |