EP0977447 - Picture quality monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, John W. 17332 S.W. Lake Haven Drive Lake Oswego, Oregon 97035 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2001/44] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/05] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305733.0 | 20.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | US19980122612 | 25.07.1998 Original published format: US 122612 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977447 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977447 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977447 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H04N17/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/26] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildqualitätsüberwachungssystem | [2000/05] | English: | Picture quality monitoring system | [2000/05] | French: | Système de contrôle de qualité d'image | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 05.04.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5473361 (PENNEY BRUCE J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0789497 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) |