EP0977121 - Non-volatile memory, recording apparatus and recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Kenichi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Koga, Noriyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Eiichi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sugiura, Mari c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Obayashi, Shuji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305882.5 | 26.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | JP19980212630 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21263098 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977121 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977121 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977121 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR);
G06F12/0292 (EP,US);
G06F3/0607 (EP,US);
G06F3/0616 (EP,US);
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/06] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtiger Speicher, Aufzeichnungsgerät und -verfahren | [2000/05] | English: | Non-volatile memory, recording apparatus and recording method | [2000/05] | French: | Mémoire non volatile, apparail et procéde d'enregistrement | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2251323 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-14,16 * figures 4,8-12 * * page 8, line 1 - page 8, line 9 * * page 22, line 11 - page 22, line 18 * * page 27, line 21 - page 28, line 2 * * page 28, line 22 - page 28, line 24 * * page 29, line 17 - page 29, line 22 * * page 33, line 5 - page 33, line 22 * * page 36, line 4 - page 36, line 8 * * page 37, line 6 - page 37, line 19 * * page 45, line 17 - page 45, line 19 * * page 47, line 3 - page 47, line 5 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US5404485 (BAN AMIR [IL]) [Y] 7* figure 6 *; | [XP]EP0887732 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3-6,9,10,13,14 * figures 1-4,12 * * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 4 * * column 5, line 31 - column 5, line 47 * * column 6, line 26 - column 6, line 40 * * column 7, line 11 - column 7, line 54 * * column 10, line 6 - column 11, line 6 * * column 11, line 27 - column 11, line 30 * * column 12, line 16 - column 12, line 58 * * column 13, line 49 - column 14, line 2 * * column 14, line 52 - column 15, line 6 * |