EP0977357 - Low loss saw filters with non-sequential coupling and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COM DEV LTD. 155 Sheldon Drive Cambridge Ontario N1R 7H6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states COM DEV LTD. 155 Sheldon Drive Cambridge, Ontario N1R 7H6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Souza, Ian A. 606 Stonebury Crescent, Waterloo Ontario, Canada N2K 3R2 / CA | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305971.6 | 27.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | US19980123363 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: US 123363 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977357 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977357 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/64, H03H9/02 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
H03H9/6446 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | H03H9/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/38] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verlustarme Oberflächenwellenfilter mit nichtsequentieller Kopplung und Betriebsverfahren derselben | [2000/05] | English: | Low loss saw filters with non-sequential coupling and method of operation thereof | [2000/05] | French: | Filtres à ondes acoustiques de surface avec couplage non séquentiel et procédé de fonctionnement correspondant | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19714085 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * page 2, lines 49-67 * * page 5, lines 16-21 * * page 12, lines 1-18 * * claim 3 * * figures 15,20 * [A] 2-7,10-12; | [A]US5363073 (HIGGINS JR ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3898592 (SOLIE LELAND P) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |