EP0976559 - Printer and method of printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonekubo, Shuji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306011.0 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | JP19980230359 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: JP 23035998 | JP19990170628 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17062899 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0976559 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0976559 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976559 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/21 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B41J2/04503 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04593 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | B41J2/045 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/14] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drucker und Druckverfahren | [2000/05] | English: | Printer and method of printing | [2000/05] | French: | Imprimante et procédé d'impression | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 20.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Request for further processing for: | 21.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 21.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4222060 (SATO TSUTOMU, et al) [A] 1,8,11,18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0816102 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,8,11-16,18 * page 9, line 58 - page 12, line 35; figures 21,22 *; | [A]EP0827838 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1* column 5, line 1 - column 15, line 44; figures 1-10 * |