EP0982003 - Cannulated tissue anchor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINVATEC CORPORATION 11311 Concept Boulevard Largo Florida 33773-4908 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Linvatec Corporation 11311 Concept Boulevard Largo, Florida 33773-4908 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trott, Frank A. 1989 Lorraine Road Largo, Florida 33774 / US | 02 /
Fucci, Joseph 2346 Grove Valley Avenue Palm Harbor, Florida 34683 / US | 03 /
Hackett, Robert C. 2803 Linthicum Place Tampa, Florida 33618 / US | 04 /
Moore, Dan T. 4945 21st Avenue North St Petersburg, Florida 33710 / US | 05 /
Bellafiore, Mark A. 2201 Palmetto Drive Clearwater, Florida 33763 / US | 06 /
Marchand, Sam R. 1170 Robmar Road Dunedin, Florida 34698 / US | 07 /
Booth, Anne F. 968 Shoreline Road Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
Trott, Frank A. 1989 Lorraine Road Largo, Florida 33774 / US | ||
02 /
Fucci, Joseph 2346 Grove Valley Avenue Palm Harbor, Florida 34683 / US | |||
03 /
Hackett, Robert C. 2803 Linthicum Place Tampa, Florida 33618 / US | |||
04 /
Moore, Dan T. 3760 First Avenue North St. Petersburg, Florida 33713 / US | |||
05 /
Bellafiore, Mark A. 2201 Palmetto Drive Clearwater, Florida 33763 / US | |||
06 /
Marchand, Sam R. 1170 Robmar Road Dunedin, Florida 34698 / US | |||
07 /
Booth, Anne F. 968 Shoreline Road Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Gambell, Derek, et al D Gambell & Co, Melbury House, 34 Southborough Road Bickley, Kent BR1 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306246.2 | 06.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980141175 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: US 141175 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982003 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982003 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/064, A61B17/04, A61B17/068 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0416 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0646 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0647 (EP,US);
Y10S606/916 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | A61B17/064 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/08] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mit einem Kanal versehender Anker für organisches Gewebe | [2000/09] | English: | Cannulated tissue anchor system | [2000/09] | French: | Ancrage a canule pour fixer des tissus | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/50] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.02.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.02.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4895148 (BAYS F BARRY [US], et al) [DA] 1-8* abstract *; | [X]US5059206 (WINTERS THOMAS F [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5152765 (ROSS RANDALL D [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 5, line 64 - column 7, line 12; figures 5-12 *; | [X]US5730744 (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document * |