EP0982850 - Method and apparatus for adjusting pilot signal relative to input signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhou, William Wei 44 Center Grove Road T-32 Randolph, New Jersey 07869 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306308.0 | 10.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980137915 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: US 137915 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982850 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982850 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H03F1/3235 (EP,US);
H04B1/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/46] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einstellung des Pilottonsignals gegenüber einem Eingangssignal | [2000/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for adjusting pilot signal relative to input signal | [2000/09] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour ajuster le signal de pilote par rapport au signal d'entrée | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 08.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0685931 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document *[A] 2,4 |