EP0982173 - Method for determination of an optimum vehicle cruise separation distance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McConnell, Arden Marcus 23060 Olmstead Dearborn, Michigan 48124 / US | 02 /
Gee, Thomas Arthur 7714 Park Avenue Allen Park, Michigan 48101 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306396.5 | 13.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980141229 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: US 141229 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982173 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, G05D1/02, G01S13/50 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP);
B60W2754/30 (EP);
B60Y2200/14 (EP);
F16H61/70 (EP);
F16H61/702 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines optimalen Abstandes zwischen Fahrzeugen auf eine gewünschte Reisegeschwindigkeit | [2000/09] | English: | Method for determination of an optimum vehicle cruise separation distance | [2000/09] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination d'un valeur optimale de la distance entre véhicules en croisière | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5262939 | US5335566 | EP0729859 | US5659304 | US5839534 | - SAE J1587 | - SAE J1922 | - SAE J1939 | - SAE J1708 |