EP0986041 - Selective release label sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Joseph D. 140 Caraway Springboro, Ohio 45066 / US | 02 /
Finster, Wayne J.D. RR3 Viroqua, Wisconsin / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Williamson, Brian, et al Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306480.7 | 17.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | US19980151000 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: US 151000 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986041 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0986041 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10, G09F3/02 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G09F3/0288 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1481 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/32] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Etikettenblatt mit selektiven Trennsystem | [2000/11] | English: | Selective release label sheet | [2000/11] | French: | Feuille d'étiquettes avec détachement sélectif | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH09204144 ; | [XA]JPH04188183 ; | [A]JPH07295474 ; | [A]US5279690 (HESS JR ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4418923 (HILL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5501393 (WALZ GERARD F [US]) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09204144 A 19970805 (SATO:KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,9,10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921022), vol. 016, no. 514, Database accession no. (P - 1442), & JP04188183 A 19920706 (TATSUKU SHISUTEMU KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,9,10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07295474 A 19951110 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |