EP0984428 - Method and system for automatically determining phonetic transcriptions associated with spelled words [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/10] | Method and system for automatically determining phonetic transciptions associated with spelled words | ||
[2002/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Contolini, Matteo 821 Cliff-Drive, No. B-1 Santa Barbara California 93109 / US | 02 /
Junqua, Jean-Claude 146 Santa Ana Avenue Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | 03 /
Kuhn, Roland 3928 Calle Cita Santa Barbara, California 93110 / US | [2000/14] |
Former [2000/10] | 01 /
Contolini, Matteo 81 Cliff Drive, No. B-1 Santa Barbara, California 93109 / US | ||
02 /
Junqua, Jean-Claude 146 Santa Ana Avenue Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | |||
03 /
Kuhn, Roland 3928 Calle Cita Santa Barbara, California 93110 / US | Representative(s) | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | ||
Former [2000/10] | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co., 352 Omega Court, Cemetery Road Sheffield S11 8FT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306666.1 | 23.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | US19980148912 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: US 148912 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984428 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984428 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984428 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06, G10L13/08 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
G10L15/065 (EP,US);
G10L2015/086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | G10L15/06, G06F17/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/41] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur automatischen Bestimmung von phonetischen Transkriptionen in Verbindung mit buchstabierten Wörtern | [2000/10] | English: | Method and system for automatically determining phonetic transcriptions associated with spelled words | [2002/48] | French: | Méthode et système pour la détermination automatique des transcriptions phonétiques associés aux mots épelés | [2002/48] |
Former [2000/10] | Method and system for automatically determining phonetic transciptions associated with spelled words | ||
Former [2000/10] | Méthode et système pour la détermination automatiqe des transcriptions phonétiques associés aux mots épelés | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 09.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.09.2003 | [2004/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0562138 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XPY]US6092044 (BAKER JAMES K [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * [Y] 7,8,13-15; | [X] - AYMAN ASADI ET AL, "AUTOMATIC MODELING FOR ADDING NEW WORDS TO A LARGE-VOCABULARY CONTINUOUS SPEECH RECOGNITION SYSTEM", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19910514), vol. CONF. 16, ISBN 0-7803-0003-3, pages 305 - 308, XP000245228 [X] 1-6,9-12 * page 306, column R, line 3 - page 308, column L, line L * | [Y] - ANDERSEN O ET AL, "Comparison of two tree-structured approaches for grapheme-to-phoneme conversion", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING, (19961003), XP002123689 [Y] 7,8,13-15 * abstract * * page 1700, column R, line 25 - page 1701, column R, line 16 * | [A] - HUMPHRIES J J ET AL, "Using accent-specific pronunciation modelling for robust speech recognition", PROCEEDINGS ICSLP 96. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (CAT. NO.96TH8206), PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, 3-6 OCT. 1996, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-3555-4, pages 2324 - 2327 vol.4, XP002154119 [A] 7,8,13-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSLP.1996.607273 |