EP0984430 - Speech recognizer with lexicon updateable by spelled word input [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/10] | Small footprint language and vocabulary independent word recognizer using registration by word spelling | ||
[2004/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junqua, Jean-Claude 146 Santa Ana Avenue Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | ||
Former [2000/10] | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co., 352 Omega Court, Cemetery Road Sheffield S11 8FT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306670.3 | 23.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | US19980148579 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: US 148579 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984430 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984430 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984430 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
G10L15/26 (EP,US);
G10L15/063 (EP,US);
G10L2015/088 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | G10L15/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spracherkenner mit durch buchstabierte Worteingabe adaptierbarem Wortschatz | [2004/20] | English: | Speech recognizer with lexicon updateable by spelled word input | [2004/20] | French: | Reconnaisseur de parole utilisant un apprentissage pour le vocabulaire par épellation de mots | [2004/20] |
Former [2000/10] | Registrierung durch Buchstabierung verwendender kleiner sprach- und vokabularunabhängiger Worterkenner | ||
Former [2000/10] | Small footprint language and vocabulary independent word recognizer using registration by word spelling | ||
Former [2000/10] | Reconnaisseur de parole à taille réduit indépendant du langage et du vocabulaire utilisant un apprentissage par éppelation des mots | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0562138 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US5732187 (SCRUGGS JEFFREY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 49 *; | [A]US5212730 (WHEATLEY BARBARA J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - line 22 * | [A] - HESS W, "SPRACHSYNTHESE - EIN GELOSTES PROBLEM?", IT + TI INFORMATIONSTECHNIK UND TECHNISCHE INFORMATIK, OLDENBOURG VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19940401), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0944-2774, pages 40 - 47, XP000465837 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [05.2] * |