EP0983902 - Erectable and collapsible receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN EUROPEAN TECHNOLOGY CENTRE LIMITED Washington Road Sunderland Tyne & Wear SR5 3NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states NISSAN EUROPEAN TECHNOLOGY CENTRE LIMITED Washington Road Sunderland, Tyne & Wear SR5 3NY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groves, Stephan Anthony Robert 36 Knights Lane Kingsthorpe Village, Northampton NN2 6QL / GB | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306945.9 | 01.09.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | GB19980019050 | 01.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9819050 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0983902 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0983902 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983902 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/02 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
B60R7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2003/32] |
Former [2001/35] | DE, ES, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/34] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbarer und auffaltbarer Behälter | [2003/06] | English: | Erectable and collapsible receptacle | [2000/10] | French: | Conteneur pliable et érigible | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/10] | Zusammenklappbarer und aufrichtbarer Behälter | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 31.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB779715 (SAMUEL MCCLELLAND, et al) [A] 1-4,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4243678 (GOETZE RENE [DE]) [A] 5,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE19650767 (BAUMEISTER & OSTLER GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 14 * abstract *; | [A]GB2274832 (QUOTATECH LTD [GB]); | [A]DE4340675 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]DE4432369 (PHILIPPART THIERRY [DE]); | [PA]EP0864466 (PRINCE CORP [US]) |