EP0987432 - Fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. 5725 Delphi Drive Troy, MI 48098 / US | [2001/12] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited 46 Park Street London W1Y 4DJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harcombe, Anthony Thomas 1 Warren Avenue Richmond, Surrey, TW10 5DZ / GB | 02 /
Cross, Robert Keith 25 The Driftway Banstead, Surrey, SM7 1LX / GB | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Carpenter, David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307203.2 | 13.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | GB19980020239 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9820239 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0987432 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0987432 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987432 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M57/02, F02M47/02, F02M59/36 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
F02M59/366 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M57/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/01] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennstoffeinspritzventil | [2000/12] | English: | Fuel injector | [2000/12] | French: | Injecteur de combustible | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.12.2002 | SE | 11.03.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0823550 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 37; figure - *; | [A]US5628293 (GIBSON DENNIS H [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 39; figures 3-6 * |