EP0990704 - Non-reducing saccharide-forming enzyme, trehalose-releasing enzyme, and process for producing saccharides using the enzymes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | [2008/50] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Takuo 525-3, Kuwano Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 02 /
Maruta, Kazuhiko 525-3, Kuwano Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Michio 1-30, Shinogoze Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 04 /
Fukuda, Shigeharu 2189 Atsu Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 05 /
Miyake, Toshio 3-23, 1-chome, Ishima-cho Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307220.6 | 13.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | JP19980258394 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25839498 | JP19980352252 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35225298 | JP19990016931 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1693199 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990704 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0990704 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990704 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N15/56, C12N9/10, C12N9/24, C12P19/14, C12P19/18, C12N1/20, // C12R1/06 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
C12N9/0004 (KR);
C12N9/2402 (EP,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US);
C12P19/18 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01001 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01002 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01003 (EP,US);
C12Y302/0102 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/14] | C12N15/54, C12N15/56, C12N9/10, C12N9/24, C12P19/14, C12P19/18, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:06) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | Nicht-reduzierende Saccharid-bildendes Enzym, Enzym das Trehalose freisetzt, und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Saccharide mittels diese Enzyme | [2000/14] | English: | Non-reducing saccharide-forming enzyme, trehalose-releasing enzyme, and process for producing saccharides using the enzymes | [2000/14] | French: | Enzyme formant des saccharide non réducteurs, enzyme libérant le trehalose et procédé de fabrication de saccharides utilisant ces enzymes | [2000/14] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0671470 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 26-33,36,37,39-46,48-50 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * examples 1-8 * * 60% identity in 585 AA overlap between SEQ ID 9 and SEQ ID 2 of EP671470 ** 60,9% identity in 586 AA overlap between SEQ ID 9 and SEQ ID 4 of EP671470 *; | [X]EP0674005 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,14-21,23-25,52-56 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * examples 1-12 * * 56.5% identity in 767 AA overlap between SEQ ID 1 and SEQ ID 4 of EP674005 * * 56.9% identity in 764 AA overlap between SEQ ID 1 and SEQ ID 2 of EP674005 *; | [X] - OHGUCHI MASAO ET AL, "Purification and properties of trehalose-synthesizing enzyme from Pseudomonas sp. F1.", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING 1997, (1997), vol. 84, no. 4, ISSN 0922-338X, pages 358 - 360, XP000884822 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 359, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0922-338X(97)89260-4 | by applicant | EP0671740 | EP0674005 |