EP0987271 - An optically active diaminophosphine ligand-transition metal complex [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Takayuki Amino Sc. lab., Ajinomoto Co. Inc., 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Izawa, Kunisuke Amino Sc. lab., Ajinomoto Co. Inc., 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307299.0 | 14.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980259801 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25980198 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987271 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C07B53/00, B01J31/24, C07F9/59, C07F9/572, C07B57/00, // C07M7:00 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
B01J31/188 (EP);
C07B53/00 (EP);
C07F15/008 (EP);
B01J2231/323 (EP);
B01J2231/645 (EP);
B01J2531/82 (EP);
B01J2531/822 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | Ein optisch-aktives Diaminophosphinligand-Übergangsmetall Komplex | [2000/12] | English: | An optically active diaminophosphine ligand-transition metal complex | [2000/12] | French: | Un complexe optiquement actif de ligand diaminophosphine-métal de transition | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 13.12.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9747633 (THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION) [X] 1-7 * claims 1,2,5,15-18 and fig.3/15, examples 14 and 15 *; | [X] - MUNZENBERG R ET AL, "Chiral platinum(II) complexes with phosphorus derivatives of the amino acid L-proline. NMR spectroscopic and x-ray structure investigations of the cis influence of tertiary phosphorus ligands", J. MOL. STRUCT. (JMOSB4,00222860);1998; VOL.444 (1-3); PP.77-90, Universitat GH Essen;Institut fur Organische Chemie; Essen; D-45117; Germany (DE), XP000865815 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2860(97)00308-6 |