EP0994049 - Screw feeder for outserts and similar articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones, Inc. 9600 South 58 Street Franklin, WI 53132-0100 / US | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asghar, Syed Ali 5880 South Madeline Ave Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53221 / US | 02 /
Larson, Mark G. 215 South Hills Drive Plymouth, Wisconsin 53073 / US | 03 /
Heard, Bruce L. 14804 West Hidden Creek Court New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US | 04 /
Boals, Clifford A. 2904 South Chicago Avenue South Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53172 / US | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307333.7 | 16.09.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | US19980170407 | 13.10.1998 Original published format: US 170407 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994049 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994049 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G33/06, B65B61/20, B65C9/10, B65C9/12 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B65G33/06 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1744 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1768 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1776 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Schneckenförderer für Beipackzettel und ähnliche Gegenstände | [2000/16] | English: | Screw feeder for outserts and similar articles | [2000/16] | French: | Alimenteur à vis pour encarts et articles similaires | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.02.2002 | FI | 20.02.2002 | GR | 20.02.2002 | NL | 20.02.2002 | DK | 20.05.2002 | PT | 20.05.2002 | SE | 20.05.2002 | IE | 16.09.2002 | LU | 16.09.2002 | CY | 30.09.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
GR | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
DK | 20.05.2002 | ||
PT | 20.05.2002 | ||
SE | 20.05.2002 | ||
IE | 16.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
GR | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
DK | 20.05.2002 | ||
PT | 20.05.2002 | ||
SE | 20.05.2002 | ||
IE | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
GR | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
PT | 20.05.2002 | ||
SE | 20.05.2002 | ||
IE | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
GR | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
PT | 20.05.2002 | ||
SE | 20.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
PT | 20.05.2002 | ||
SE | 20.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 20.02.2002 | |
SE | 20.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 20.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]CH518858 (FERAG AG [CH]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * column 1, line 1 - line 3 * * column 1, line 42 * * column 3, line 14 - line 19 * * column 3, line 48 - line 67 * * column 4, line 44 - line 47 * * column 4, line 24 * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0814038 (GD SPA [IT]) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 17 - line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]US5785803 (SCHIESSL HANS G [US]) [A] 8-10 * column 5, line 28 - line 50; figure 1 ** column 8, line 26 - line 16; figures 14-16 * |