EP0990676 - Biodegradable vapor corrosion inhibitor products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORTEC CORPORATION 4119 White Bear Parkway St. Paul Minnesota 55110 / US | [2006/22] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states CORTEC CORPORATION 4119 White Bear Parkway St. Paul, Minnesota 55110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chandler, Christophe 3122 Copper Oaks Trail Woodbury, Minnesota 55125 / US | 02 /
Miksic, Boris A. 21 Evergreen Road North Oaks, Minnesota 55127 / US | 03 /
Bradley, Scott J. 2974 Waubesa Avenue Madison Wisconsin 53711 / US | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/14] | 01 /
Chandler, Christophe 3122 Copper Oaks Trail Woodbury, Minnesota 55125 / US | ||
02 /
Miksic, Boris A. 21 Evergreen Road North Oaks, Minnesota 55127 / US | |||
03 /
Bradley, Scott J. 18612 Highway R Denmark, Wisconsin 54208 / US | Representative(s) | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/15] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/14] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307534.0 | 23.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | US19980164887 | 01.10.1998 Original published format: US 164887 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990676 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990676 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L67/00, C08L3/00, B65D65/46, C08K3/00, C08K5/00 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/0033 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0033, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/51] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Biologisch abbaubare Dampfkorrosionsinhibitoren | [2000/14] | English: | Biodegradable vapor corrosion inhibitor products | [2000/14] | French: | Produits biodégradables qui contiennent des inhibiteurs de corrosion de vapeur | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07150077 ; | [Y]US4657689 (DARDEN JEROME W [US]) [Y] 1-8* claims 1,10 *; | [Y]DE3618841 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 27 * * column 2, line 67 - line 68; claim 5 *; | [Y]WO9308014 (BIO PROD INT [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 3 * * page 1, paragraph 3; claims 13,15 *; | [X]WO9835349 (IMATION CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * example 1; claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 32, Database accession no. 1995-243807, XP002127575 & JPH07150077 A 19950613 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract * |