EP0990796 - Assembly of a mechanical or hydraulic drive and a piston pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarke, Peter c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | For all designated states Clarke, Rene c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | For all designated states Clarke, Brendon c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | For all designated states Clarke, Carl c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | For all designated states Clarke, Cheryl c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | For all designated states Clarke, Edit c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | [2006/09] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Clarke, Peter c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell, Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | ||
For all designated states Clarke, Rene c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell, Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | |||
For all designated states Clarke, Brendan c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell, Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | |||
For all designated states Clarke, Carl c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell, Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | |||
For all designated states Clarke, Cheryl c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell, Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | |||
For all designated states Clarke, Edit c/o Energy Chemical & Equipment Co., Southwell Road Business Park, Off Upton Road Southwell, Nottingham NG25 0TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, Brendan Alexander c/o 8 Olive Grove, Burton Joyce Nottingham NG14 5JF / GB | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307761.9 | 30.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | GB19980021308 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: GB 9821308 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990796 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0990796 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990796 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/22, F04B9/04, F04B9/103, F04B49/12, F04B9/105 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
F04B53/22 (EP,US);
F04B49/12 (EP,US);
F04B9/04 (EP);
F04B9/1035 (EP);
F04B2201/0206 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/14] | F04B53/22, F04B9/04, F04B9/103, F04B49/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/29] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammenbau eines mechanischen oder hydraulischen Antriebs mit einer Kolbenpumpe | [2000/14] | English: | Assembly of a mechanical or hydraulic drive and a piston pump | [2000/14] | French: | Assemblage d'un entraînement mécanique ou hydrostatique pour une pompe à piston | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2005 | 30.09.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.03.2006 | ES | 12.06.2006 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/34] | ES | 12.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2107798 (CRAGGS THOMAS ARTHUR) [X] 1 * page 2, line 77 - line 130; figures 1,3 *; | [DA]GB677136 (THOMAS WILLETT & COMPANY LTD, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2159888 (WILLETT & CO LIMITED THOMAS) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |